Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Raymund (Franz Julius) Tschudi (Tschudy), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1914Born
193621.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 May 194025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Oct 195945.3SelectedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
14 Nov 195945.3ConfirmedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
14 Nov 195945.3InstalledAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
5 Sep 196955.1ResignedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
21 Jun 201196.9DiedAbbot Emeritus of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Raymund (Franz Julius) Tschudi (Tschudy) (VIAF: 293303484)
Abbot Raymund (Franz Julius) Tschudi (Tschudy) O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Maria Einsiedeln

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBasel

  • a priest for 71.0 years

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 21 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 23 Jan 2018