Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Trivulzio

Deceased

Bishop of Como


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jul 1499AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
31 Jul 1508AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
9 Jan 1509AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
8 Jan 1518AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
1519¹DiedBishop of Como, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Trivulzio:
Bishop Antonio Trivulzio Bishop of Como

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 121, and Page 182
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013