Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Trivulzio (Sr.), O.C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Como

Note/Previous Titular See: (Can. Reg. of Sant'Antonio)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1457BornMilan
27 Aug 148730.6AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
28 Sep 150043.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 150043.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
1 Dec 150548.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
4 Jan 150750.0AppointedCardinal-Priest
18 Mar 150851.2DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Trivulzio (Sr.):
Cardinal Antonio Trivulzio (Sr.) O.C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Como

  • a cardinal for 7.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1500
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013