Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Scaramuccia Cardinal Trivulzio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Como, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane

Administrator of Vienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1465¹Born
14 Apr 150843.2AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
1 Jul 151752.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151752.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
8 Jan 151853.0ResignedBishop of Como, Italy
26 Sep 151954.7AppointedAdministrator of Piacenza, Italy
31 May 152560.4ResignedAdministrator of Piacenza, Italy
18 Mar 152762.2AppointedAdministrator of Vienne, France
3 Aug 152762.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Como, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Scaramuccia Trivulzio (VIAF: 30386848)
Scaramuccia Cardinal Trivulzio (born 1465, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceMagenzano (or Maguzzano), Monastery, Verona, Diocese of Verona
Buried Place (Original)Magenzano (or Maguzzano), Monastery, Verona, Diocese of Verona

  • a cardinal for 10.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018