Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giangiacomo Teodoro Cardinal Trivulzio

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597BornMilan, Italy
19 Nov 162932.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 162933.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
17 Oct 164447.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
12 Dec 164447.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
23 Sep 165255.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
21 Jul 165356.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
14 May 165558.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
3 Aug 165659.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

MicroData Summary for Giangiacomo Teodoro Trivulzio:
Cardinal Giangiacomo Teodoro Trivulzio (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

  • a cardinal for 26.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 1629

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013