Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Agostino (Dante) Trapè, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Prior General Emeritus of Order of St. Augustine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1915Born
13 Oct 193116.7ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
25 Jul 193722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
26 Aug 196550.6AppointedPrior General of Order of St. Augustine
10 Sep 197156.6ResignedPrior General of Order of St. Augustine
14 Jun 198772.4DiedPriest of Order of St. Augustine

MicroData Summary for Agostino (Dante) Trapè (VIAF: 7406183)
Father Agostino (Dante) Trapè O.S.A. (born , died ) Prior General Emeritus of Order of St. Augustine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontegiorgio, Italy

  • a priest for 49.8 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast