Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Tosti

Deceased

Librarian of the Vatican Library

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1776Born
25 Apr 182245.5AppointedOfficial to Sardinia, Italy
15 Jan 182952.2ResignedOfficial to Sardinia, Italy
12 Feb 183861.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
18 Feb 183962.3Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 183962.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
13 Jan 186083.2AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
20 Mar 186689.4DiedLibrarian of the Vatican Library

MicroData Summary for Antonio Tosti (VIAF: 61537527)
Antonio Cardinal Tosti (born , died ) Librarian of Vatican Library

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 28.1 years

Source(s):
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Mar 2018