Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Tavelli da Tossignano, Gesuati †

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara, Italy

Member of Apostolic Clerics of Saint Jerome


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1386²Born
2 Jul 140822.5EnteredMember of Apostolic Clerics of Saint Jerome
28 Oct 143145.8AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
10 Dec 143145.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Dec 143145.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Dec 143145.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ferrara, Italy
24 Jul 144660.5DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tavelli da Tossignano
Bishop Giovanni Tavelli da Tossignano Gesuati (born 1386, died ) Bishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCordignano
Ordained PriestBishop's House, Chapel, Mantova, Diocese of Mantova
Ordained BishopBishop's House, Chapel, Mantova, Diocese of Mantova
Death PlaceFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara

  • a priest for 14.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 153
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,714
  • b: CB, 2 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast