Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Maria Cardinal Torreggiani

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1697Born
26 Nov 175356.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 175356.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
22 Apr 175456.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
22 Apr 176567.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
6 Jan 177779.2DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Torreggiani
Luigi Maria Cardinal Torreggiani (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFlorence, Italy

  • a cardinal for 23.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast