Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Castone Torriani (della Torre)

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Patriarch of Aquileia


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Feb 1308SelectedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
15 Jul 1308ConfirmedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
12 Oct 1308³Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
10 Jan 1317AppointedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
20 Aug 1318DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Castone Torriani (della Torre):
Archbishop Castone Torriani (della Torre) (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 332, and Page 99
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,894

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014