Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal de Torquemada, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1388BornValladolid
140315.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Dec 143951.9Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 144052.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
27 Jul 144052.5AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
11 Jul 144254.5AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
10 Nov 144557.8ResignedBishop of Orense, Spain
Sep 144658.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
Apr 146072.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
31 Jul 146072.5AppointedBishop of León, Spain
26 Jan 146375.0AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
5 May 146375.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
8 Jun 146678.4ResignedBishop of Orense, Spain
26 Sep 146880.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Juan de Torquemada:
Juan Cardinal de Torquemada O.P. (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a cardinal for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 308, Number 192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015