Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jerzy Jan Tomziński, O.S.P.P.E. †

Deceased

Prior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1918Born
1935²16.1EnteredMember of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
6 Aug 193617.7ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
12 Jul 194223.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
16 Apr 194425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
23 Jul 196344.6AppointedPrior General of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
3 Jun 197556.5CeasedPrior General of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit
14 Nov 2021102.9DiedPriest of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Jan Tomziński (VIAF: 101897536)
Father Jerzy Jan Tomziński O.S.P.P.E. (born , died ) Prior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Paul the First Hermit

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrzystajń, Diocese of Częstochowa, Poland
Ordained PriestOur Lady Chapel, Jasna Góra, Monastery, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa, Poland
Death PlaceJasna Góra, Monastery, Częstochowa, Archdiocese of Częstochowa, Poland

  • a priest for 77.5 years

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 14 Nov 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022