Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dietrich Tolke, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jul 1403AppointedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
14 Oct 1403Ordained BishopBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
1405²DiedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dietrich Tolke
Bishop Dietrich Tolke O.T. (died 1405) Bishop of Reval (Rewel)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopO.T., Church, Marienburg

  • a bishop for 1.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 420
  • ob: ATh, 27 Mar 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,037

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast