Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Tocco, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1514²Born
6 Nov 156450.8AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
5 Sep 157258.6AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
11 May 158369.3AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
31 Jan 158571.0DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benito Tocco
Bishop Benito Tocco O.S.B. (born 1514, died ) Bishop of Lérida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopMonastery, Montserrat
Death PlaceMonastery, Montserrat

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 202, and Page 212
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 332
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,143
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,389
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 75, Number 444
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast