Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giovanni Tiepolo

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1570Born
20 Nov 161949.6AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
8 Dec 161949.6Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
7 May 163161.0DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tiepolo (VIAF: 37264617)
Patriarch Giovanni Tiepolo (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopVenice, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceVenice, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Current)San Pietro al Castello, Cathedral Basilica, Venice, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 362
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 25
  • ob/c2: AT, 4 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017