Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Metody Terlecki, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Feb 1628SelectedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
31 Aug 1630InstalledBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
7 Jun 1649DiedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Metody Terlecki
Bishop Metody Terlecki O.S.B.M. (died ) Bishop of Chełm

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast