Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antin Terlecki

Deceased

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹Born
4 May 166238.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
22 Feb 166440.1SucceededBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
23 Mar 166541.2Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
28 Dec 166945.9DiedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Antin Terlecki:
Bishop Antin Terlecki (born 1624, died ) Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok

  • a bishop for 4.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 272
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,521

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015