Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco de Teramo

Deceased

Bishop of Sarno


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Mar 1400AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
15 Dec 1404AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
29 Dec 1418AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
1439²DiedBishop of Sarno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco de Teramo:
Bishop Marco de Teramo , Bishop of Sarno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 436, and Page 146
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Aug 2014