Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Tchang

Deceased

Prefect of Chowchich [Zhouzhi], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1872Born
8 Dec 189927.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 193259.6AppointedPrefect of Chowchich [Zhouzhi], China
1 Jul 1940³67.7DiedPrefect of Chowchich [Zhouzhi], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Tchang
Father John Tchang (born , died ) Prefect of Chowchich [Zhouzhi]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInkiapuo (Sianfu)
Death PlaceChowchich, Prefecture Apostolic of Chowchich [Zhouzhi]

  • a priest for 40.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast