Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Lucas Tchao (Zhao Qinghua)

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Chihfeng [Chifeng], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1874Born
15 Oct 189925.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 193257.6AppointedPrefect of Chihfeng [Chifeng], China
21 Apr 194974.9ResignedPrefect of Chihfeng [Chifeng], China

MicroData Summary for Lucas Tchao (Zhao Qinghua)
Father Lucas Tchao (Zhao Qinghua) (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Chihfeng [Chifeng]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaochantoung

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast