Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Corrado Tartarini

Deceased

Bishop of Forli, Italy

Apostolic Nuncio to Savoy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Sep 1599AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
2 Aug 1601AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
13 Feb 1602DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Corrado Tartarini
Bishop Corrado Tartarini (died ) Bishop of Forli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittà di Castello

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 189
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 288
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast