Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Tarlati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jul 1312AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
19 Aug 1312Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
1325²ResignedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guido Tarlati
Bishop Guido Tarlati , Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 104
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018