Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onufry Kajetan Szembek

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
May 1743³Born
25 Mar 176925.8Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 179653.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Płock, Poland
27 Jun 179653.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
5 Sep 179754.3SucceededBishop of Płock, Poland
31 Dec 180865.6DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Onufry Kajetan Szembek
Bishop Onufry Kajetan Szembek (born May 1743, died ) Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSawa

  • a priest for 39.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 342, and Page 349
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast