Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikołaj Romanow Świrski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland

Titular Bishop of Citrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600Born
12 Dec 164444.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland
12 Dec 164444.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Citrus
4 Jun 164545.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citrus
14 May 167676.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Romanow Świrski
Bishop Mikołaj Romanow Świrski (born 1600, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSurez

  • a bishop for 30.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 151
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 61
  • b: CB, 25 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 26 May 2018

Quantcast