Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Swillington, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of London, England

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jul 1532AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
12 Jul 1532AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
18 Aug 1532Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
1533²AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of London, England, Great Britain
1546²DiedAuxiliary Bishop of London, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Swillington:
Bishop Thomas Swillington O.S.A. , Auxiliary Bishop of London

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 273
  • b/ob/c2: CB, 22 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Jul 2014