Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gottfried Schenk von Limpurg

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1404Born
14 Aug 144238.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Würzburg, Germany
16 Oct 144339.7AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
8 Nov 144440.8Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
1 Apr 145551.2DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gottfried Schenk von Limpurg:
Bishop Gottfried Schenk von Limpurg (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a bishop for 10.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 163
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,754

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013