Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonysamy Susairaj, M.E.P.

Prefect Emeritus of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1951 Born
27 May 197826.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
16 Jul 199745.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia
27 May 200048.4AppointedPrefect of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia
25 Jul 201967.5ResignedPrefect of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia

MicroData Summary for Antonysamy Susairaj
Father Antonysamy Susairaj M.E.P. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Kompong-Cham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElathagiri

Please contact the Father through the Prefecture Apostolic of Kompong-Cham.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast