Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo de Suressi (Sulixio)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Craina, Albania


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1482AppointedArchbishop of Craina, Albania
13 Apr 1483Ordained BishopArchbishop of Craina, Albania
1488¹ResignedArchbishop of Craina, Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo de Suressi (Sulixio)
Archbishop Giacomo de Suressi (Sulixio) , Archbishop Emeritus of Craina

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 139
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Oct 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,483, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast