Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Zigmund Szuppán

Deceased

Priest


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1814Born
17 Feb 183723.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Feb 183723.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 187056.1SelectedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
27 Jun 187056.4ConfirmedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
7 Oct 187056.7ResignedBishop-Elect of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
17 Jul 188167.4DiedPriest

MicroData Summary for Zigmund Szuppán (VIAF: 308742814)
Father Zigmund Szuppán (born , died ) Priest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKremnitz
Death PlaceOstrihom

  • a priest for 44.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 408
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,870

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast