Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert Suerber, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Riga


Events

DateEventTitle
1240¹AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
30 Sep 1240Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
30 Mar 1246AppointedAdministrator of Chiemsee, Germany
1247²ResignedAdministrator of Chiemsee, Germany
9 Jul 1247AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lübeck, Germany
1253²AppointedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
1273²DiedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Albert Suerber (VIAF: 10928673)
Archbishop Albert Suerber O.P. (died 1273) Archbishop of Riga

  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 108, and Page 311
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 420, and Page 184
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 28 Jan 2016