Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Subiet-Cardot

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montpellier, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1514Born
24 Oct 157258.0AppointedBishop of Montpellier, France
1573¹58.2Ordained BishopBishop of Montpellier, France
4 Jul 159681.7ResignedBishop of Montpellier, France
8 Nov 159682.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Montpellier, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Subiet-Cardot
Bishop Antonio de Subiet-Cardot (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montpellier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChateaurenard, Bouches du Rhone
Ordained BishopAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Death PlaceMontpellier, Diocese of Montpellier

  • a bishop for 23.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 232
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast