Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Suárez de Deza

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción de la Vega


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Nov 1504AppointedArchbishop of Hyaguata, Dominican Republic
13 Aug 1511AppointedBishop of Concepción de la Vega, Dominican Republic
3 Mar 1512Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción de la Vega, Dominican Republic
17 Mar 1523DiedBishop of Concepción de la Vega, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Pedro Suárez de Deza:
Bishop Pedro Suárez de Deza (died ) Bishop of Concepción de la Vega

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,049
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 28, Number 94
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 187

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013