Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Streifrock

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Nov 1355AppointedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
17 Nov 1355³Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
1 Sep 1373DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Streifrock
Bishop Johannes Streifrock (died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 515
  • b/c2: ATh, 4 Oct 2018
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,880

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast