Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Story

Deceased

Bishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1420¹Born
18 Jul 146848.5AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
2 Oct 146848.7Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
11 Feb 147858.1AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
29 Jan 150383.0DiedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Story (VIAF: 49147118256326341659)
Bishop Edward Story (born 1420, died ) Bishop of Chichester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint Etienne, Westminster

  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 247
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 128, and Page 170
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 239
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 92
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1468, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Nov 2018

Quantcast