Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Bell, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Carlisle, England


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Feb 1478AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
26 Apr 1478Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
4 Sep 1495ResignedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
1496DiedBishop Emeritus of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Bell:
Bishop Richard Bell O.S.B. Bishop Emeritus of Carlisle

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 239
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 170
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013