Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert de Stichill, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Sep 1260SelectedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
23 Nov 1260ConfirmedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
13 Feb 1261Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
4 Aug 1274DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert de Stichill
Bishop Robert de Stichill O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Durham

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 62
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 287
  • osb: CB, 20 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016