Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Godfrey Ludham

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jul 1258AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
22 Sep 1258Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
12 Jan 1265DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Godfrey Ludham
Archbishop Godfrey Ludham (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 61
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Mar 2016