Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Stewart

Deceased

Bishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1443Born
7 Aug 148239.5AppointedBishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain
12 Aug 148239.6AppointedBishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain
29 Sep 150158.7DiedBishop of Moray, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Andrew Stewart
Bishop Andrew Stewart (born 1443, died ) Bishop of Moray

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast