Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dietrick Stechow, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brandenburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Apr 1459AppointedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
8 Jul 1459Ordained BishopBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
12 Jan 1472DiedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Dietrick Stechow (VIAF: 299689679)
Bishop Dietrick Stechow O. Praem. (died ) Bishop of Brandenburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Brandenburg, Diocese of Brandenburg

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 110
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,610
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,459, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast