Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Friedrich von Beichlingen

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Apr 1445SelectedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
10 Aug 1445ConfirmedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
29 Aug 1445Ordained BishopArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
11 Nov 1464DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Beichlingen:
Archbishop Friedrich von Beichlingen (died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

  • a bishop for 19.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,607
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013