Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Spreti

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1658³BornRavenna
3 Feb 170950.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Feb 170950.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 170950.4AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
Jan 1727²68.1DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Spreti:
Bishop Camillo Spreti (born , died Jan 1727) Bishop of Cervia

  • a priest for 17.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1726
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 155
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015