Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tomáš Cardinal Špidlík, S.J. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1919BornBoskovice, Czech Republic
24 Sep 194222.7ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
22 Aug 194929.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Oct 200383.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
21 Oct 200383.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 Apr 201090.3DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

MicroData Summary for Tomáš Špidlík:
Tomáš Cardinal Špidlík S.J. (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a cardinal for 6.4 years

Source(s):
  • d: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2010
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015