Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Spenner (Spender), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Nov 1482AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
4 Nov 1482AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
18 Nov 1482Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
5 Dec 1503DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Spenner (Spender)
Bishop Johann Spenner (Spender) O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarburg
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 142
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,482, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast