Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Spät von Faimingen

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1309²AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
22 Jun 1309Ordained BishopBishop of Augsburg, Germany
14 Mar 1331DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Spät von Faimingen (VIAF: 23194341)
Bishop Friedrich Spät von Faimingen (died ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopDonauwörth

  • a bishop for 21.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 116
  • ob: ATh, 17 Feb 2018
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,648

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast