Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Sorrentino

Deceased

Bishop of Troia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1597Born
23 Mar 162426.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 166365.3AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
18 Feb 166365.3Ordained BishopBishop of Troia, Italy
17 Jun 167577.6DiedBishop of Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Sorrentino
Bishop Sebastiano Sorrentino (born , died ) Bishop of Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCava
Ordained BishopSan Silvestro al Quirinale, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 346
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 18
  • ob/c2: AT, 28 Aug 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,029

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast