Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulus Zorčić, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Valachia (Križevci)

Titular Bishop of Plataea


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1671AppointedVicar Apostolic of Valachia (Križevci), Croatia
20 Nov 1671AppointedTitular Bishop of Plataea
Jan 1672²Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plataea
23 Jan 1685DiedVicar Apostolic of Valachia (Križevci), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paulus Zorčić
Bishop Paulus Zorčić O.S.B.M. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Valachia

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 317
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 49
  • ob/c2: AT, 21 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Jun 2016