Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo de Solórzano

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jan 1567AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
12 Oct 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
18 Feb 1570AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
26 Sep 1580DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo de Solórzano
Bishop Gonzalo de Solórzano (died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorralba, Diocese of Cuenca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tui, Diocese of Tuy
Death PlaceNorena, Asturias

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 78, Number 462
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245, and Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,567, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast