Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Dymitr Solikowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1539¹Born
28 Mar 158344.2AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
12 Jun 158344.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
27 Jun 160364.4DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Dymitr Solikowski (VIAF: 25033321)
Archbishop Jan Dymitr Solikowski (born 1539, died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Ordained BishopKalicz

  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1583, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018