Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo de Santa Maria

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jan 1419AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
7 Jun 1419AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
2 Jul 1423AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
10 Aug 1446AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
12 Dec 1448DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo de Santa Maria
Bishop Gonzalo de Santa Maria (died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 235
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 402, and Page 114
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast