Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg von Slatkonia

Deceased

Bishop of Wien, Austria

Bishop of Pedena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1456¹Born
1513¹57.0AppointedBishop of Pedena, Austria
12 Aug 151357.6AppointedBishop of Wien, Austria
13 Nov 151357.8Ordained BishopBishop of Wien, Austria
26 Apr 152266.3DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg von Slatkonia (VIAF: 72284426)
Bishop Georg von Slatkonia (born 1456, died ) Bishop of Wien

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Etienne, Cathedral, Wien, Diocese of Wien

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 333, and Page 272
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1513, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 23 May 2018

Quantcast